IL HB0410 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administrative Adjudications Division of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a person who has served as a judge in Illinois is not required to complete specified formal training requirements in order to be an administrative hearing officer. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-ADMIN HEARING OFFICER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0065 |
2021-07-09 | House | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |