IL HB0439 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In the Section concerning post-mastectomy care, requires insurance companies to provide coverage for (1) a minimum of 24 hours of inpatient care following a lymph node dissection for the treatment of breast cancer or (2) a minimum of 48 hours of inpatient care following a mastectomy or breast conserving surgery for the treatment of breast cancer. Prohibits insurance companies from giving incentives or penalties to physicians or providers. Provides that insurance companies must provide notice of the required coverage to each participant and beneficiary. Makes other changes.
Title
POST-MASTECTOMY CARE
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Emily McAsey [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=439&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0439.htm |