IL HB0456 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to award grants to students in financial need whose household income is less than the poverty guidelines updated periodically in the Federal Register by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and who are enrolled for at least 15 credit hours in a public university. Provides that the Commission shall receive funding for the grants through appropriations, with each grant awarded being in an amount sufficient to pay the cost of attendance at the university in which the student is enrolled for 2 semesters of enrollment within an academic year. Defines "cost of attendance" to mean the tuition and fee, room and board, and book and supply costs related to a student's attendance at a public university.
Title
PUBLIC UNIVERSITY GRANT PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-008-000 |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |