IL HB0464 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the deposit of money received by the Division of Highways of the Department of Transportation into the road fund.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] |
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Maggie Crotty [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0398 |
2011-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2011 |
2011-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 017-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6c | Amended Code | Citation Text |