IL HB0466 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that property that is located in Champaign County and is the subject of an annexation agreement is subject to the ordinances, control, and jurisdiction of the annexing municipality if the property is located (i) within 1.5 miles of the corporate boundaries of the municipality or (ii) more than 1.5 miles from the corporate boundaries of the municipality unless the county board retains jurisdiction.
Title
MUNI CD-ANNEXATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0163 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-31 | First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-31 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-033-002 | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-001-000 | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |