IL HB0559 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Health Care Workforce Reinforcement Act. Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that any person who was issued a temporary out-of-state permit or temporary reinstatement permit by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation in response to the COVID-19 pandemic may continue to practice under his or her temporary out-of-state permit if he or she submits an application for licensure by endorsement to the Department on or before May 11, 2023. Provides for license application requirements for holders of temporary out-of-state permits or temporary reinstatement permits in specified professions. Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act, the Nursing Home Care Act, the MC/DD Act, the ID/DD Community Care Act, and the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. Provides that, during a statewide public health emergency, the Department of Public Health and the Department of Human Services may take specified actions pertaining to inspections within an appropriate time frame to the extent feasible. Provides that probationary and provisional licenses may be extended for an additional 120 if requested and approved by the Department. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that during a public health emergency, any provision of the Act that would prevent a physician licensed to practice medicine in all of its branches under the Act from delegating any and all authority prescribed to the physician by law to international medical graduate physicians who are working in response to the public health emergency declared by the Governor are suspended. Defines "international medical graduate physician". Amends the Radiation Protection Act of 1990. Provides that during a public health emergency, provisions that limit the validity of industrial radiography certifications to 5 years and industrial radiography trainee certifications to 2 years shall be suspended. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that the "practice of pharmacy" includes vaccination of patients 7 years of age and older for COVID-19 or influenza subcutaneously, intramuscularly, or orally; administration of COVID-19 therapeutics subcutaneously, intramuscularly, or orally; and ordering and administration of tests and screenings for (i) influenza, SARS-COV 2, and other emerging and existing public health threats. Provides that a registered pharmacy technician or student pharmacist may administer COVID-19 therapeutics and COVID-19 and influenza vaccinations subject to certain conditions. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code and the Illinois Insurance Code to provide coverage for in-pharmacy COVID and influenza testing, screening, vaccination, and treatments. Effective immediately.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Mike Coffey [R] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-04-27 | House | Effective Date April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0001 |
2023-04-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-04-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-04-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 112-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-04-19 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak-Hilton |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 405 | 0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |