IL HB0699 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that the penalty for aggravated battery that causes great bodily harm, or permanent disability or disfigurement to any victim (rather than to specified categories of persons) is a Class 1 felony. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for aggravated battery that causes great bodily harm, or permanent disability or disfigurement shall receive no more than 4.5 days of good conduct credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD&CD CORR-AGG BATTERY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 30, 2009 | |
2009-05-29 | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 | |
2009-05-28 | House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote; SA 1,3 | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. James D. Brosnahan | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. James D. Brosnahan | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 | |
2009-05-20 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cullerton | |
2009-05-19 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-001 | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-04-30 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-04-22 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-04-21 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-21 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James D. Brosnahan |