IL HB0710 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Unified Code of Corrections. Repeals provision that with the written approval of the Governor, the Department of State Police may enter into agreements with other Departments created by the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois for the furlough of inmates of the penitentiary to those other Departments for their use in research programs being conducted by them. Effective immediately.
Title
INMATE FURLOUGH RESEARCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-13 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0371 | |
2009-08-13 | Effective Date August 13, 2009 | |
2009-08-13 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |