IL HB0714 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not impose a tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition. Provides that the provisions of any ordinance or resolution, in effect or adopted, on or after the effective date of the bill by any unit of local government, including a home rule unit, that imposes a tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition are invalid and void. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-LOCAL REG
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=714&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0714.htm |