IL HB0733 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Budget Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a municipality's noncompliance with the Act.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 330 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |