IL HB0743 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Green Jobs and Technology Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-10-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 140 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |