IL HB0746 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the compensation to be paid to the Public Defender.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-032-001 |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2016-05-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-001-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-4007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |