IL HB0787 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides for the election of Metropolitan Water Reclamation District commissioners from the same subdistricts as members of the Cook County Board of Review. Phases in the election from the subdistricts at the 2010, 2012, and 2014 general elections. Authorizes cumulative voting for commissioners. Changes the terms of commissioners from 6 years to a combination of 4-year and 2-year terms. Effective immediately.
Title
METRO WATER SUBDISTRICTS
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=787&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0787.htm |