IL HB0787 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Eliminates provision that a licensee under the Act shall not knowingly carry a firearm on any bus, train, or form of transportation paid for in whole or in part with public funds, and any building, real property, and parking area under the control of a public transportation facility paid for in whole or in part with public funds.
Title
CONCEAL CARRY-PUBLIC TRANSPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=787&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0787.htm |