IL HB0788 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Unfunded Mandate Exemption Act. Provides that all units of local government, school districts, and public colleges and universities may, by a majority vote of the governing body, exempt themselves from specified mandates that are unfunded if it is determined that it is not economically feasible to comply with the unfunded mandate. Provides for notice, public hearing, and other requirements in order for a governing body to exempt itself from any mandate. Prohibits exemption from federally required mandates, mandates pertaining to health and public safety, mandates pertaining to civil rights, and instructional mandates for school districts. Provides for appeal procedures by State agencies affected by exempted mandates. Amends the State Mandates Act. Provides that, if the Act conflicts with the Local Unfunded Mandate Exemption Act, the Local Unfunded Mandate Exemption Act controls.
Title
LOCAL GOV-UNFUNDED MANDATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |