IL HB0797 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, if an owner or other person in lawful possession or control of private property has contracted with a third-party vendor to issue permission to park on the private property through an online service vendor, and a vehicle has been removed from the property associated with the address prior to the time allocated according to the receipt provided to the vehicle owner or authorized user of the vehicle from the online service vendor, then the online service vendor, within 10 business days after presentation of the towing invoice and receipt from the vehicle owner or authorized user, shall remit to the vehicle owner or authorized user of the vehicle all costs charged to the vehicle owner or authorized user of a vehicle for towing costs, invoice fees, and fees for 24 hours of storage, plus $25 for reimbursement to travel to the vehicle location held by the towing company. Provides that if the online service vendor fails to comply, the online service vendor commits an unlawful practice within the meaning of the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes a corresponding change in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.
Title
VEH CD-ONLINE PARKING
Sponsors
Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18a-302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |