IL HB0802 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1014 |
2014-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 074-040-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary |
2014-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-009-000 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-002-001 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-039-000 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |