IL HB0836 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0900
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0900
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Health Insurance Coverage Premium Misalignment Study Act. Sets forth provisions concerning the purpose of the Act and findings. Provides that the Department of Insurance shall oversee a study to explore rate setting approaches that may yield a misalignment of premiums across different tiers of coverage in Illinois' individual health insurance market. Provides that the study shall produce cost estimates for Illinois residents addressing metal-level premium misalignment policy along with the impact of the policy on health insurance affordability and access and the uninsured rates for low-income and middle-income residents, with break-out data by geography, race, ethnicity, and income level. Provides that the study shall evaluate how premium realignment if implemented would affect costs and outcomes for Illinoisans. Provides that the Department shall develop and submit, no later than January 1, 2024, a report to the General Assembly and the Governor concerning the design, costs, benefits, and implementation of premium realignment to increase affordability and access to health care coverage that leverages existing State infrastructure.
Title
PRIVATE DETECTIVE-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0900 |
2022-05-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-001-003 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-11-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 447 | 15-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 35-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 35-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |