IL HB0852 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0771
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0771
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, in consultation with the Department of Transportation, may establish and administer a test program to place at rest areas along highways computer kiosks that provide information on tourism activities in the State. Sets forth the requirements of the test program.
Title
DCEO-TOURISM-COMPUTER KIOSKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0771 | |
2009-08-28 | Effective Date August 28, 2009 | |
2009-08-28 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-05-31 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis | |
2009-05-30 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 | |
2009-05-30 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hunter | |
2009-05-29 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce; 006-000-001 | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-05-29 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Commerce | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce | |
2009-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Commerce; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Commerce | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |