IL HB0879 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that a member may not be registered as a lobbyist, or make expenditures, receive compensation, or receive reimbursement for actual expenses for lobbying, within a period of one year immediately after termination of the member's most recent term of office or for the remainder of the term of office from which the person resigned, whichever is longer.
Title
GA MEMBER-REVOLVING DOOR BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-11-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=879&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0879.htm |