IL HB0882 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 10% of the qualified costs incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purposes of purchasing and planting qualified trees in the State. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-TREE PLANTING CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=882&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0882.htm |