IL HB0924 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Act.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Do Pass Labor and Commerce; 010-005-001 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-18 | House | Verified |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-050-003 |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 012-008-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |