IL HB0958 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, in addition to any duty under the Open Meetings Act, the board shall provide written notice of each meeting, as defined in the Open Meetings Act, to the mayor or village or town president at least 48 hours prior to that meeting. Requires the notice to set forth the time, date, location, and agenda of the meeting. Provides that, if the board fails to provide the notice required under this Section for any meeting, then any action taken at that meeting is invalid. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-POLICE & FIRE-NOTICE
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Hamos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Remains in Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Motion Do Pass - Lost Personnel and Pensions Committee; 003-003-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=958&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0958.htm |