IL HB0958 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that domestic battery is a Class 4 felony if the defendant has one or 2 prior convictions under the Code for domestic battery. Provides that domestic battery is a Class 3 felony if the defendant had 3 prior convictions under the Code for domestic battery. Provides that domestic battery is a Class 2 felony if the defendant had 4 or more prior convictions under the Code for domestic battery.
Title
CRIM CD-DOMESTIC BATTERY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0187 |
2013-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |