IL HB0966 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the MR/DD Community Care Act and amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that all intermediate care facilities for the developmentally disabled and long-term care for under age 22 facilities shall be licensed by the Department of Public Health under the MR/DD Community Care Act instead of under the Nursing Home Care Act. Makes the provisions in the MR/DD Community Care Act substantially the same as those in the Nursing Home Care Act, including provisions for the rights of residents and responsibilities of facilities, licensing, violations and penalties, and transfer or discharge of residents. Amends the Department of Human Services Act, the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act, the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Nursing Home Administrators Licensing and Disciplinary Act, the Illinois Public Aid Code, the Nursing Home Grant Assistance Act, the Unified Code of Corrections and other Acts to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HOME-INTERMEDIATE CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaShawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=966&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0966.htm |