IL HB0966 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds the St. Louis Blues to the list of professional sports team logos available under the Professional Sports Teams license plates provisions.
Title
SPORTS TEAM LICENSE PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-007-000 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-658 | Amended Code | Citation Text |