IL HB0977 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for a person to impose a surcharge upon a consumer who elects to pay by use of a credit card instead of making payment by cash, check, or similar means of payment. Effective immediately.
Title
PROHIBIT CREDIT CARD SURCHARGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=977&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0977.htm |