IL HB0981 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that the board of directors of the Illinois Insurance Guaranty Fund shall consist of not less than 5 nor more than 11 persons, with 2 public members appointed by the Director of Insurance (instead of not less than 5 nor more than 9 persons).
Title
INS CD-GUARANTY FUND-BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0202 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 026-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |