IL HB1001 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from December 31, 2013 to December 31, 2023. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a completed initial license application and a completed initial license application by endorsement that has been submitted to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall be processed by the Department within 45 calendar days after receipt. Makes changes to the various fees for the renewal of a license for a resident of Illinois and nonresidents. Provides that an individual who has a 3-year temporary license and applies for an initial license shall pay the fee for a renewal of a license instead of applying for an initial license under certain provisions of the Act. Provides that the State Comptroller shall order and the State Treasurer shall transfer $9,600,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
MED PRACT-LIC FEES-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Josh Harms [R] |
Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1001&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1001.htm |