IL HB1015 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0844
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0844
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Makes changes throughout the Act that mark the transfer of authority to administer and enforce the Act to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation (rather than the Office of Banks and Real Estate). Replaces "associate real estate appraiser" with "associate real estate trainee appraiser" throughout the Act. Changes the Real Estate Appraisal Board to the Real Estate Appraisal Administration and Disciplinary Board. Provides that a person who violates certain licensure provisions for a second or any subsequent time is guilty of a Class 4 felony. Sets forth additional education requirements for licensure under the Act. Removes a provision allowing a person who holds a valid license as a licensed real estate appraiser, issued pursuant to a predecessor Act, to convert that license to an associate real estate appraiser license. Removes a provision concerning licensed real estate appraiser's licenses issued pursuant to a predecessor Act and provides that an associate real estate trainee appraiser license may not be renewed more than 2 times. Adds a provision concerning temporary license suspension. Provides that an education provider may use an instructor who is a faculty member in good standing with an accredited college or university or community college or who is an approved appraisal instructor from an appraisal organization that is a member of the Appraisal Foundation. Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Makes other changes. Repeals a Section concerning identifying a client. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ESTATE APPRAISER LIC-MISC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-30 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-23 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0844 | |
2009-12-23 | Effective Date December 23, 2009 | |
2009-12-23 | Governor Approved | |
2009-11-25 | Returned to Governor for Certification | |
2009-10-30 | Both Houses Accepted Amendatory Veto | |
2009-10-30 | Accept Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 052-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Licensed Activities | |
2009-10-27 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-27 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 28, 2009 | |
2009-10-14 | Accept Amendatory Veto - House Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-10-14 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-10-05 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-05 | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |