IL HB1072 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to ensure parents and guardians of pupils enrolled in the school district are free to petition the school board and provide public comment at all public and regularly scheduled meetings, have access to certain information, are well-informed on specified subject matters, and have the right to meet with a pupil's teacher at least twice per school year. Requires a school board to ensure curriculum and learning materials are posted on the school district's Internet website. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-RIGHTS OF PARENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-03 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1072&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1072.htm |