IL HB1076 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Designations Act. Prohibits the non-trivial costs associated with the production or installation of an honorary memorial, monument, plaque, sign, or similar item, including those costs arising as a result of the passage of a resolution or joint resolution of the Illinois House of Representatives calling for the production or installation of such an item, from being paid by the State unless (i) a law passed by the General Assembly expressly provides for the payment of those costs by the State or (ii) the person being honored has by gift or bequest made a donation that is being recognized by the production and installation of that item. Authorizes the State Treasurer to accept payment for these production and installation costs from an honoree or his or her agent. Requires the State Treasurer to deposit these moneys into the Honorary Designation Fund and, after being notified in writing by the honoree or his or her agent of the State agency that is ultimately responsible for producing and installing the item, to transfer from the Fund and to that State agency the moneys deposited by that person for that purpose. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Honorary Designation Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.
Title
HONORARY SIGNS-STATE PAYMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-06-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2012-06-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-06-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000 |
2012-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-06-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2012-06-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2012 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 10, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 9, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-002-001 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-11-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.786 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 460 | 213 | New Code | See Bill Text |