IL HB1103 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that registered tax purchasers are prohibited from making campaign contributions to candidates for county treasurer in the county in which the tax purchaser is registered. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that tax purchasers in all counties must register with the county collector. Preempts the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-TX PURCHASER CONTRIB
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] | Rep. Darlene Senger [R] |
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Richard Morthland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ren |
2011-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1103&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1103.htm |