IL HB1111 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Civil Practice Law.
Title
IMDMA-MARRIAGE SOLEMNIZATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] |
Rep. Sharon Chung [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-002-000 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 22, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-040-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-005-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |