IL HB1130 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department to develop and administer a 3-year pilot program of waivers of motor fuel content rules and standards to retail fuel marketers who sell motor fuel blends containing 10% to 85% ethanol by volume. Limits to 25 the number of pump sites for which waivers may be issued. Limits pump sites to one per waiver applicant. Requires the Department to adopt rules and report to the Governor and General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
AG-ETHANOL PUMP WAIVERS
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Boland [D] | Rep. Richard Myers [R] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard P. Myers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1130&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1130.htm |