IL HB1173 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Agency Appropriation Act. Requires separate legislative bills for appropriations to each State agency.
Title
AGENCY APPROPRIATION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-06-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-048-000 | |
2010-05-25 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-05-25 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1173&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1173.htm |