IL HB1222 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Passenger Protection Act. Provides that upon completion of a child passenger safety instructional course to the satisfaction of the technician conducting the course, the technician shall issue a letter of completion printed on a form or in a manner required by the Illinois Department of Transportation (rather than on the technician's letterhead). Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
CHILD SAFETY COURSE FORMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0026 |
2011-06-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-06-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 25 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |