IL HB1361 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rental Housing Support Program Act. In a provision concerning the Rental Housing Support Program, provides that the Illinois Housing Development Authority shall distribute amounts for the Program solely from annual receipts on deposit in the Rental Housing Support Program Fund that are appropriated in each year for distribution by the Authority for the Program, and not from any other source of funds for the Authority (rather than the Authority shall distribute amounts appropriated for the Program from the Rental Housing Support Program Fund and any other appropriations provided for the Program). Defines "annual receipts" to mean revenue derived from the Rental Housing Support Program State surcharge from July 1 to June 30. Provides that the Authority shall perform annual reconciliations of all distributions made in connection with the Program and may offset future distributions to balance geographic distribution requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
IHDA-RENTAL HOUSING PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0097 |
2015-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2015 |
2015-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Development & Housing Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Economic Development & Housing Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
310 | 105 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
310 | 105 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
310 | 105 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |