IL HB1376 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Disclosure Act. Provides that a seller of residential property to which the Act applies shall have the sewer line from the residential property to the sewer main, or, in the case of a septic system, to the septic tank, inspected by a licensed plumber using video camera inspection technology, and that the licensed plumber shall prepare a written, dated report that includes his or her review of the condition of the line. Provides that the seller shall attach the report to the residential real property disclosure report form required under the Act.
Title
REAL EST DISCLOSURE-SEWER LINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2015-03-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-17 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-17 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2015-03-16 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2015-03-16 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2015-03-13 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2015-03-13 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2015-03-12 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2015-03-12 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-03-12 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-12 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-12 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-12 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-12 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-12 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-12 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-12 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-007-000 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 77 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1376&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1376.htm |