IL HB1377 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that local units of government shall report to the Illinois Department of Transportation and the Department shall post on its official website all preferred truck routes under the local unit of government's jurisdiction which are not classified as Class II or Class III truck routes. Provides that local units of government shall report their designated truck route network or lack of truck routes to the Illinois Department of Transportation. Provides that the Secretary of State shall include in its commercial drivers license curriculum and study guide, and in materials relating to obtaining or renewing a commercial drivers license, the distinctions between utilizing a truck-attributed global positioning system device and other non-truck-attributed global positioning system devices. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
VEH CD-TRUCK ROUTES/CDL GPS
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Franco Coladipietro [R] | Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. John Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0291 |
2011-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-01 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-03-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2011-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-214 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |