IL HB1399 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that a person commits the offense of lewd sexual display in a penal institution when he or she is in the custody of a penal institution and knowingly engages in any of the following acts while he or she is confined in a penal institution: engages in a lewd exposure of the genitals or anus (rather than of the body or sex organs, anus, or breast), for the purpose or effect of intimidating, harassing, or threatening one whom he or she believes to be in the presence or view of such acts. Provides that a person convicted of a second (rather than third) or subsequent violation for lewd sexual display in a penal institution is guilty of a Class 4 felony. Deletes provision that unwillingness or failure to successfully complete a court-ordered mental health court treatment program shall result in a conviction and the convicted person shall be subject to the penalties for the offense. Provides that unwillingness to participate in a court-ordered mental health court treatment program may result in prosecution for the offense. Provides that failure to complete a mental health treatment court program shall have the consequences prescribed by the rules and regulations of that treatment court program. Changes the date of repeal of the provisions from January 1, 2030 to January 1, 2028. Provides that the annual report shall list the race and ethnicity of persons referred for prosecution or charged with lewd sexual display in a penal institution. Deletes the amendatory changes to the Sex Offender Registration Act.
Title
CRIM CD-LEWD SEXUAL DISPLAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0283 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Back To Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 003-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-9.2-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.2-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |