IL HB1420 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Treasurer's seal.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] |
Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-07 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2010-11-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-11-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-11-17 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 014-002-000 | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-10 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-09 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1420&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1420.htm |