IL HB1423 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning disability determinations.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 3-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |