IL HB1465 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. In provisions concerning the performance of functions by the highway commissioner of a road district, provides that, except for professional services, when the cost of construction, materials, supplies, new machinery or equipment exceeds $30,000 (instead of $20,000), the contract for such construction, materials, supplies, machinery or equipment shall be let to the lowest responsible bidder if specified conditions are met. Effective immediately.
Title
HWY CD-CONSTRUCTION BIDDING
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Dennis Tipsword [R] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0125 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 6-201.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |