IL HB1471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning endangering the life or health of a child.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-005-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-21.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12C-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |