IL HB1510 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Road Fund.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-12-02 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-12-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-12-02 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 1, 2010 | |
2010-11-30 | Second Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 | |
2010-11-29 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-11-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-11-18 | First Reading | |
2010-11-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-11-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-11-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-11-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-11-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-12 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-12 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-10 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-10 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |