IL HB1513 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality may, within 6 months after making an overpayment of wages directly to an employee, deduct the overpayment from the employee's regularly scheduled wage payment without the written consent of the employee. Sets forth the conditions that must be met in order for a municipality to deduct from an employee's wages. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-WAGES/BENEFITS-OVERPAY
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0120 |
2011-07-14 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |