IL HB1546 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-08 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-08 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the definition of "year".
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1546&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1546.htm |