IL HB1548 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that, by no later than July 1, 2012, the Regional Transportation Authority, Commuter Rail Division, Suburban Bus Division, and Chicago Transit Authority shall be consolidated into the Northeastern Transit Authority. Provides that the powers, duties, and obligations of the Regional Transportation Authority, Commuter Rail Division, Suburban Bus Division, and Chicago Transit Authority shall be exercised by the Northeastern Transit Authority. Creates the Northeastern Transit Authority. Sets forth the appointment and terms of the board members for the Northeastern Transit Authority. Provides that board members shall serve without compensation, but may be reimbursed for expenses incurred in the performance of their official duties. Effective immediately.
Title
NORTHEASTERN TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3605 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 1.01a | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 1.01b | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1548&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1548.htm |