IL HB1558 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lake Michigan Offshore Wind Energy Council Act. Creates the Lake Michigan Offshore Wind Energy Council as a separate entity within the Department of Natural Resources. Provides that the Council shall consist of (1) the Director of Natural Resources, the Director of the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, the Director of the Illinois Power Agency, the Chairman of the Illinois Commerce Commission, or their designees, (2) certain other public members selected by the Director of Natural Resources, and (3) members of the General Assembly appointed by the House and Senate leadership. Provides that members of the Council shall serve without compensation, but may be reimbursed for actual and necessary expenses incurred in the performance of their official duties as members of the Council. Provides that the Council shall examine certain topics related to offshore wind energy facilities on Lake Michigan and report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2011. Provides that the Act shall be repealed on July 1, 2012. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
OFFSHORE WIND ENERGY COUNCIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 90 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0266 |
2011-08-08 | House | Effective Date August 8, 2011 |
2011-08-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 090-016-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-005-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 016-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2011 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-03-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-018-000 |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 016-002-000 |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |